MY SHINING STAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since registration we have supported families across the UK, many local to us in Kent, but also further afield in Scotland and the Isle of Wight. We have won funding from many small businesses as well as corporations such as Tesco, NISA and Co-Op. We are now endorsed by CLIC Sargent and The Teenage Cancer Trust at The Royal Marsden Sutton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Bunn | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stanley | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Justice | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.13k | £76.02k | £124.09k | £132.82k | £222.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.89k | £59.38k | £91.12k | £125.70k | £149.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Nov 2016 as amended on 15 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
3. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 3.1 RELIEVING AND ASSISTING FAMILIES IN NEED OF SUPPORT WHEN THEIR CHILDREN ARE DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER, IN ANY PART OF THE UK, WHO REQUIRE FINANCIAL AID AND ADVICE, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH MEDICAL EXPENSES/ADVICE, HOUSING SUPPORT, TRAVEL EXPENSES, FUNDRAISING ADVICE/SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE WITH ANY OTHER ISSUES THAT ARISE AS A DIRECT RESULT OF THEIR CHILD’S DIAGNOSES; 3.2 FUNDING CONVENTIONAL MEDICAL TREATMENTS FOR CANCER THAT ARE UNAVAILABLE IN THE UK (THROUGH THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE/NHS OR FROM OTHER HEALTH PROVIDERS) WITH THE AIM OF EXTENDING OPTIONS FOR LIFE EXPECTANCY AMONG CHILDREN WITH CANCER, AND FUNDING MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO CANCER WITH THE AIM TO INCREASE CANCER SURVIVAL RATES (THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH BEING AVAILABLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT). NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Contact information
- Address:
-
9a High Street
Rainham
Kent
ME8 7HX
- Phone:
- 01634362126
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window