Accounts and annual returns TOURDESANDS

Charity Number: 1170438
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time