WAVE MUSWELL HILL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wave Hub (previously Wave Cafe) was established to promote social inclusion and raise public awareness of the issues faced by people with learning disabilities. We aim to demonstrate what it means to value everyone equally. We run a creative arts cafe in Muswell Hill as a social enterprise where people of all abilities can work and socialise together.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 01 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BERNARD WRIGHT MA, MBA | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|||||
KATHARINE ANN JONES | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lotte Carlebach | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Merriman | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ANNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
OPHIR YARON | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Tshulak | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.57k | £42.38k | £57.47k | £79.82k | £54.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.28k | £39.19k | £48.83k | £71.86k | £66.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BARNET, CAMDEN, ENFIELD, HARINGEY AND ISLINGTON TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES OR SPECIAL NEEDS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROMOTING THEIR SOCIAL INCLUSION, PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; B) PROVIDING ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION OR TRAINING TO HELP DEVELOP THEIR SOCIAL AND PRACTICAL SKILLS AND RECEIVE SUPPORT; C) RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC OF THE ISSUES THAT FACE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES OR SPECIAL NEEDS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, ‘SPECIAL NEEDS’ MEANS THE INDIVIDUAL REQUIREMENTS OF A PERSON WITH A MENTAL, EMOTIONAL, OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 ROSEBERY ROAD
LONDON
N10 2LD
- Phone:
- 07706323904
- Email:
- info@wavehub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window