Financial history THE CYBER TRUST

Charity number: 1171883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58 £9.17k £19.13k £41.94k £2.00k
Total expenditure £655 £1.73k £1.46k £46.47k £29.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A