THE BUTTERLEY IRONWORKS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seeking to secure the important heritage features of the former Butterley Works including the unique underground wharves of the Cromford Canal, in Ripley, Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 04 July 2017: CIO registration
- THE BUTTERLEY TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Dennis Freeborn | Chair | 13 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Timothy John Castledine | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Brendan Martin Stafford | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID ALAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Joyce Slack | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT GRASAR | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
MICHAEL KELLEY | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71 | £12 | £13.01k | £23.04k | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.04k | £29.40k | £8.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £10.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR ALL BY INCREASING AND INSPIRING THE PUBLIC'S UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE OF RIPLEY, DERBYSHIRE, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BUTTERLEY WORKS (INCLUDING THE CROMFORD CANAL) AND THE MIDLAND RAILWAY SITES IN RIPLEY SINCE THE 18TH CENTURY; AND 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HERITAGE BY THE PROTECTION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE HISTORIC BUILDINGS AND MONUMENTS (INCLUDING THE CROMFORD CANAL) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 3. THE PROVISION AND DEVELOPMENT OF A MUSEUM COMPRISING A COMPLEX OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL IMPORTANCE AS A MEANS OF RECORDING AND EXEMPLIFYING THE CONTRIBUTION OF THE AREA SINCE THE 18TH CENTURY TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE MODERN INDUSTRIALISED WORLD, FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 ALFRED STREET
RIPLEY
DE5 3LD
- Phone:
- 01773479000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window