RED TROUSER DAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Vision: We envisage a world without Colorectal (Bowel) Cancer Who are we? An independent community of patients and clinicians supporting research into the prevention, early diagnosis and cure of colorectal cancer. Our core activity is raising awareness, raising funds to support research and having fun in the process to ease the stress and anxiety of living with a Bowel Cancer diagnosis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL FINCH | Chair | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wright | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Richards | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Longhurst | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stefan Fafinski DL | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY MARK BRADLEY | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia George | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.44k | £26.24k | £38.19k | £33.12k | £29.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.90k | £28.91k | £31.67k | £38.79k | £23.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF COLORECTAL CANCER FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A)INCREASING AWARENESS OF COLORECTAL CANCER AND ITS SYMPTOMS ACROSS THE POPULATION IN THE UK; (B)FUNDING LEADING DIAGNOSTIC AND TREATMENT RESEARCH INTO COLORECTAL CANCER, WHERE THERE IS A SHORTFALL IN OTHER FUNDING SOURCES, OR WHERE PIONEERING RESEARCH CANNOT BE FUNDED BY OTHER SOURCES, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH IN ORDER TO: •INCREASE THE LEVEL OF EARLY DIAGNOSIS AND EARLY TREATMENT; •IMPROVE TREATMENT OUTCOMES •IMPROVE THE EXPERIENCE OF PATIENTS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS, REDUCING THEIR ANXIETY, HELPING THEM FEEL IN CONTROL WITH INCREASED HOPE, FROM DIAGNOSIS, THROUGH TREATMENT AND POST TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 St. John's Villas
LONDON
N19 3EG
- Phone:
- 01245 929100
- Email:
- info@redtrouserday.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window