THE PATRICIA HAREWOOD TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was established to assist with the conservation and preservation of the collections at Harewood House. It is to be endowed with funds from the estate of the late Dowager Countess of Harewood and, once these funds have been received, the trustees will work with the Harewood House Trust?s Collections Committee to determine the best use of the funds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 17 November 2016: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 23 October 2024: Funds transferred to 517753 HAREWOOD HOUSE TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £669.58k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.60k | £0 | £670.72k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £402.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £115.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £3.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 March 2024 | 498 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 159 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2022 | 524 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF FURNITURE, STATUES, PICTURES, BOOKS AND OTHER CHATTELS ("THE CHATTELS") OF ANY DESCRIPTION CONNECTED WITH, ORDINARILY KEPT AT OR OTHERWISE APPROPRIATE TO BE KEPT AT HAREWOOD HOUSE, HAREWOOD, LEEDS LS17 9LG ("HAREWOOD HOUSE"). 2. THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF HAREWOOD HOUSE AND ITS ANCILLARY BUILDINGS, GARDENS, ARBORETA, WOODLANDS AND PARK OR SUCH PART OR PARTS THEREOF AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE HELD BY, ON TRUST FOR, OR FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF, HAREWOOD HOUSE TRUST LIMITED (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 517753). 3. TO FACILITATE AND ENCOURAGE THE USE AND OCCUPATION OF THE WHOLE OR PART OF HAREWOOD HOUSE AND THE USE OF THE CHATTELS FOR CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window