OLDER CITIZENS ADVOCACY YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OCAY provides a free, confidential and independent advocacy service to older people in the City of York and its surrounding area in order to provide relief to older people in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £13,338 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 12 July 2017: CIO registration
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 1094279 OLDER CITIZENS ADVOCACY YORK
- OCAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Caldicott | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Leighton | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Louise Regan | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ann Walker | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew William Knight | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Tracey Elaine Dennison | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA DOUGHTY | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.82k | £123.64k | £109.29k | £123.11k | £85.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.86k | £84.74k | £133.36k | £93.48k | £126.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.91k | £5.50k | £8.07k | £7.00k | £13.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE OBJECTIVE OF OLDER CITIZENS ADVOCACY YORK (OCAY) IS TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED IN THE CITY OF YORK AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A GENERAL ADVOCACY SERVICE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Older Citizens Advocacy York
Priory Street Centre
15 Priory Street
YORK
YO1 6ET
- Phone:
- 01904676200
- Email:
- info@ocay.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window