THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FRENSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promotion of Christianity though the staging of events and meetings, and the distribution of literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
103 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 May 2017: Standard registration
- FRENSHAM PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Jane Louise Walker | Chair | 13 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Jillian Kay Billings | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Hetherington | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Lee-Corbin | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smith | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Chadney | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MORAG ELIZABETH CROSSLEY JAMES | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY TELFER | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
JON SAVAGE | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JULIE NOCKELS | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ELIZABETH POTTER | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER FRANK JAMES | Trustee | 01 March 2002 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.52k | £99.59k | £100.09k | £126.79k | £90.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.05k | £123.45k | £90.77k | £124.67k | £110.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.06k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
THE STREET
FRENSHAM
FARNHAM
GU10 3DT
- Phone:
- 01252792137
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window