BRADFORD ON AVON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve and develop public education and appreciation of choral music in all its aspects by any means the Trustees shall see fit including the presentation of public concerts and recitals. The charity is bases in Bradford on Avon, Wiltshire where it holds its' rehearsals and most of its public performances although on occasions performances are given in a wider area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH ANN DAVIES | Chair | 12 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles Thompson | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ford | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Morwyth Penelope Minter | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Baiano | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher David Wraight | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Jennifer Raymond | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Dean Broad | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARGARET WAY | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.37k | £4.92k | £15.86k | £23.81k | £20.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £6.18k | £20.49k | £21.13k | £18.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT, INCLUDING THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 TYNING ROAD
WINSLEY
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01225862965
- Email:
- secretary@boachoral.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window