BLYTH RESOURCE & INITIATIVE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support those who are looking to secure long-term employment within South East Northumberland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,958 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 27 January 2017: CIO registration
- 12 July 2018: Funds received from 516385 BLYTH RESOURCE & INITIATIVE CENTRE
- BRIC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Snowdon | Chair | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Oliver | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Oliver | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla Louise Thompson | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Jayne Agar | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Eaton | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Phillip Hall | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.64k | £149.91k | £138.19k | £165.34k | £112.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.95k | £141.70k | £130.39k | £123.49k | £145.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.30k | £2.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jan 2017 as amended on 13 Jan 2021 as amended on 29 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE BLYTH VALLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, RESOURCES AND SUPPORT TO BUILD WORK EXPERIENCE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS, PARTICULARLY AMONG THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR LOW-WAGED. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BLYTH VALLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blyth Community Enterprise Centre
Ridley Street
Blyth
Northumb
- Phone:
- 01670542845
- Email:
- education@bricblyth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window