Financial history SPORT AND ARTS IN THE COMMUNITY (SPARC) SOUTH WEST SHROPSHIRE

Charity number: 1170997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £44.57k £37.14k £18.80k £82.97k £125.34k
Total expenditure £25.05k £27.34k £92.95k £27.41k £24.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £15.00k £2.00k N/A £2.60k