ST MARY'S COLLEGE OSCOTT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates the Roman Catholic Seminary of the Archdiocese of Birmingham at Oscott College, for the education of men in Holy Orders (Priesthood and Permanent Diaconate). The programme of study lasts up to 6 years. The CIO also maintains the College building and grounds and operates a Catholic Cemetery. Other lawful charitable activities for the propagation of the RC faith are undertaken.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£2,600,000
Donations and legacies | £5.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.66m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £940.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,762,000
Raising funds | £98.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,009,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £98.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.66m |
People

44 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 10 May 2017: CIO registration
- 23 October 2024: Funds received from 529036 ST MARY'S COLLEGE (OSCOTT COLLEGE)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Most Reverend BERNARD LONGLEY | Chair | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Gaskell | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Right Reverend David Ernest Charles Evans | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|||||
John Richard Gibbons | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Mellor | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Bernard Thaddeus O'Driscoll | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Francis Swinburne | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|||||
The Right Reverand RICHARD ADRIAN WALKER LLB STL | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILLIAM GRANT | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.65m | £2.60m | £2.95m | £3.19m | £2.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80m | £2.90m | £3.04m | £3.79m | £3.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £81.59k | £30.35k | £22.00k | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £110.00k | £67.00k | £55.00k | £602.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.52m | £1.70m | £1.96m | £1.71m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £936.00k | £797.00k | £907.00k | £877.00k | £940.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £82.00k | £30.00k | £22.00k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £22.00k | £62.00k | £53.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.70m | £2.79m | £2.92m | £3.69m | £3.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £100.00k | £107.00k | £114.00k | £101.00k | £98.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.00k | £19.00k | £15.00k | £18.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £100.00k | £107.00k | £114.00k | £101.00k | £98.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.37m | £14.31m | £14.32m | £15.76m | £15.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | £29.92m | £35.12m | £32.56m | £30.56m | £31.56m | |
|
Other assets | £607.00k | £695.00k | £527.00k | £330.00k | £188.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £215.00k | £141.00k | £149.00k | £177.00k | £220.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2017 as amended on 14 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE ONE OR MORE THAN ONE OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS AS SHALL BE DIRECTED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE ARCHBISHOP IN HIS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION:- (1) THE PROVISION OF A COLLEGE FOR THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS BEING CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH EITHER GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE (2) THE MAINTENANCE UPKEEP AND EQUIPPING OF ANY SUCH COLLEGE INCLUDING EXTENSIONS AND ANY REBUILDING OR RE-EQUIPPING (3) THE EDUCATION MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF STUDENTS IN THE DIOCESE BEING CANDIDATES FOR HOLY ORDERS IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH (4) THE ONGOING FORMATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE IN HOLY ORDERS IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH (5) THE PROVISION OF LAND FOR AND THE UPKEEP MAINTENANCE AND ADMINISTRATION OF A ROMAN CATHOLIC CEMETERY OR PLACE FOR BURIAL (OR DISPOSAL BY ANY OTHER MEANS FOR THE TIME BEING AUTHORISED BY THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH) OF THE MORTAL REMAINS OF DECEASED PERSONS SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE MAINTENANCE AND PROPAGATION OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE ARCHBISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHARITIES ACT 2011.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OSCOTT COLLEGE
CHESTER ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B73 5AA
- Phone:
- 01213215030
- Email:
- enquiries@oscott.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window