Financial history CHRIST CHURCH CENTRAL LEEDS

Charity Number: 1171484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £112.87k £106.69k £122.42k £288.53k £255.82k
Total expenditure £79.62k £102.27k £127.64k £181.41k £177.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A