MEDIEVAL COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sharing knowledge about Coventry in the Middle Ages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 10 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARK WEBB | Chair | 01 May 2007 |
|
|||||
Hannah Khan | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Young | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Parry Mr | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma MacLellan | Trustee | 15 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUKE BRYANT | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA KAY | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.88k | £10.65k | £7.46k | £4.42k | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £8.37k | £11.38k | £7.40k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MEDIEVAL HISTORY OF COVENTRY THROUGH THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
21b-21d Lindfield Gardens
LONDON
NW3 6PX
- Phone:
- 07740817309
- Email:
- info@medievalcoventry.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window