THE DAVIDGE USHER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO makes grants to organisations in Northamptonshire & Oxfordshire for the advancement of education, traing health & religious activities. The Trustees review all requests for financial support and assess the probable impact on the community or organisation of providing financial help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 May 2019: CIO registration
- 16 April 2021: Funds received from 1073939 THE DAVIDGE USHER TRUST
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Allinson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Michael Berridge | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Usher | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN SMITH | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK STUART ARROWSMITH | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|||||
MARY PHILIPPA ROSE JAMES | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|||||
RICHARD ARROWSMITH | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £490.75k | £431.51k | £466.85k | £488.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £270.22k | £298.16k | £322.86k | £428.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 May 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN THE PARISH OF LITTLE HOUGHTON IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON; 2. THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON AND THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD; 4. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT AND DISABLED IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON; 5. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FISHER GERMAN LLP
Innovation House
Welland Business Park
Valley Way
Market Harborough
LE16 7PS
- Phone:
- 01858410200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window