Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, CLAPHAM

Charity Number: 1172605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £114.47k £169.16k £158.48k £178.70k £178.48k
Total expenditure £117.10k £172.19k £157.22k £193.79k £180.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.99k N/A N/A N/A