SHIPSTON ON STOUR AREA U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable purposes of the Shipston on Stour Area U3A are:- Membership of the Shipston on Stour Area U3A shall be open to individuals who are in their Third Age and are interested in advance education and in particular the education of people not in full time gainful employment residing in Shipston on Stour and its surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 04 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Davies | Chair | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Nelson Keayes | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Brenda Boyle | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD SALISBURY TAYLOR | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
John Napier Dunlop | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Anne Shepperd | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.31k | £5.62k | £1.92k | £6.69k | £5.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.80k | £2.48k | £3.92k | £5.00k | £5.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 2014 as amended on 28 Jun 2022 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
The charity’s object (‘the object’) is the advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Shipston on Stour and its surrounding locality.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Meadow Lane
Tysoe
WARWICK
CV35 0TY
- Phone:
- 07836 385543
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window