Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOOD SHEPHERD WITH ST. PETER, LEE

Charity Number: 1171429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £134.09k £143.08k £159.19k £178.36k £212.37k
Total expenditure £207.60k £173.52k £149.97k £185.82k £199.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A