Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOOD SHEPHERD WITH ST. PETER, LEE

Charity number: 1171429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard John Burns Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
John Bramson Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Simon Frewin Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Tanya Jane Hilborne Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Peter Burns Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
John Stevens Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Fran Lechler Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Louise Grace Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Peter Watson Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Sue Tearle Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Clare Johnson Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
James William Murdoch Trustee 24 April 2019
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
John Richard Murray Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
ADRIAAN GOOSEN Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
CONWAY PHILLIP TEARLE Trustee 24 April 2016
NEW GREENWICH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: 10 days late