SPALDING RECTORY FEOFFEES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
payment of stipend to Vicar of Spalding and furthering the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the ecclesiastical parish of St Mary and St Nicolas Spalding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 September 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Robert Parker | Chair | 01 December 2004 |
|
|
||||
Roger Jeffery Smith | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Clements | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan Machin | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Helen Hay | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARK BRIGGS | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR TOM CHARLTON | Trustee | 11 October 1995 |
|
|||||
MELVYN PRICE | Trustee | 01 November 1992 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN RICHARDSON NELL | Trustee | 20 January 1992 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAAN PIETER VAN EGMOND | Trustee | 19 June 1989 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.82k | £90.23k | £84.53k | £83.80k | £89.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.54k | £107.70k | £100.82k | £92.82k | £92.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 1 OCTOBER 2003 as amended on 02 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
(1) FEOFFEES FIRST TO PAY A STIPEND TO THE VICAR OF SPALDING THAT WILL BE NO LESS THAN THE HIGHEST STIPEND USUALLY PAYABLE TO CLERGY (NOT BEING BISHOPS, ARCHDEACONS OR THE DEAN) WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN WITH THE FEOFFEES (SUBJECT THERETO) HAVING DISCRETION AS TO THE AMOUNT OF THE STIPEND TO BE PAID FROM TIME TO TIME; AND THEN (2) APPLY THE RESIDUE OF THE INCOME TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OR ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY AND ST. NICOLAS, SPALDING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maples Solicitors LLP
23 New Road
Spalding
PE11 1DH
- Phone:
- 01775722261
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window