Trustees CMV ACTION

Charity number: 1171773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hui Liang Chair 01 February 2025
None on record
Angela Johnson Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Natalie Battle Trustee 01 February 2025
HEY KIDS TYPE 1 DIABETES CHILDREN AND FAMILY SUPPORT GROUP
Received: On time
Paul Miller Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Alice Fletcher-Etherington Trustee 11 June 2022
None on record
Angela Elizabeth Andrews Trustee 18 January 2020
None on record
SARAH ALISON DEWAR Trustee 30 November 2015
None on record
ELIZABETH ESTALL Trustee 30 November 2012
None on record