JACK'S JOURNEY

Charity number: 1171182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Jack's Journey supports Cumbrian families who have received a cancer diagnosis and are currently, or have recently finished, cancer treatment. This is through financial grant making, but also through smaller gifts to aid their time in hospital. In addition, Jack's Journey provides holiday accommodation for families from across the north who are currently, or recently finished, cancer treatment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £28,329
Total expenditure: £23,972

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Darlington
  • Durham
  • Gateshead
  • Hartlepool
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 2017: CIO registration
  • 08 February 2021: Funds received from 1154158 HOPE FOR HOLLY
  • 20 October 2022: Funds received from 1167445 ALEX'S ANGELS FOUNDATION
  • 26 September 2023: Funds received from 1134277 CHELSEA'S ANGELS
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW THOMAS GIBSON Chair 19 January 2017
None on record
JESSICA SOUTHWELL Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record
KENNETH HODGSON Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record
SAMANTHA LOUISE GIBSON Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record
CAROL REID Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record
JOHN GLYN COWARD Trustee 19 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.19k £22.76k £14.52k £41.08k £28.33k
Total expenditure £24.85k £13.21k £22.83k £22.09k £23.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Went Meadows Close
Dearham
MARYPORT
CA15 7HN
Phone:
07799747554
Website:

Www.jacksjourney.org.uk