Trustees BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST

Charity number: 1172358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY ANNE MCMAHON Chair 16 March 2017
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy David Barfoot Trustee 27 March 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' WITH SAINT PETER HUTTON
Received: On time
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
ISABEL HELEN BURGESS Trustee 10 January 2024
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
THE PETTIT CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev PAUL STUART HAMILTON Trustee 10 May 2023
JOHN WALLIS
Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
Nicholas James Higgs Trustee 09 November 2022
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Bastable Trustee 01 November 2017
BRENTWOOD BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
Jeffrey John Fair Trustee 16 March 2017
ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN TEACHERS
Received: On time
ALTITUDE CHURCH
Received: On time
BRENTWOOD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time