Newport and Carisbrooke PCC

Charity number: 1170906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Wight

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEWPORT MINSTER (Working name)
  • Newport Minster (Previous name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF ST THOMAS THE APOSTLE AND ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY, NEWPORT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Christopher James Bradish Trustee 15 September 2024
None on record
Deborah Cook Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Peter Hewitt Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Andrew Rolf Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Lorraine Grundon Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Peta Adrienne Stevenson Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Rev Emma Cooksey Trustee 06 January 2022
None on record
Stephanie Taylor Trustee 18 July 2021
None on record
THOMAS ARTHUR HARDEN Trustee 18 July 2021
None on record
Rev Stephen Sutcliffe Trustee 20 April 2021
ROBERT URRY'S GIFT
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
WORSLEY'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
LORD HUNSDON'S GIFT
Received: On time
SERLE'S GIFT
Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
David Graham Salter Trustee 20 April 2021
ISLE OF WIGHT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Ruth Elizabeth Chambers Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Richard Hugh Smout Trustee 28 February 2021
ISLE OF WIGHT NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Allan George Timbrell Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
PETER BARRY EDNAY Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Stephen Alfred Sibbeck Smith Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Peter John Whitlock Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Marian Elizabeth Brett-Hill Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Anne Cameron Hewitt Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Anne Susan Smout Trustee 28 February 2021
None on record
Janet Holliday Trustee 30 March 2018
THE UPPER ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £251.37k £394.86k £383.05k £1.48m £941.78k
Total expenditure £224.81k £189.85k £312.78k £1.18m £1.04m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.85k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.38m £863.73k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £78.64k £65.23k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £97 £4.79k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £17.04k £8.03k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £100 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.18m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.02k £1.13k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £15.45k £12.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £20.00k £36.81k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £29.75k £32.09k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £628.58k £533.82k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £49.58k £55.53k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 September 2024 307 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEWPORT PARISH CENTRE
TOWN LANE
NEWPORT
PO30 1JU
Phone:
01983821961