RIGHT TO EDUCATION INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RTE promotes education as a human right, making international and national law accessible to everybody. We conduct research and legal analysis and we develop tools and guides to help understand and effectively use human rights mechanisms to claim and enforce the right to education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIN MARTINEZ | Chair | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ignacio SAIZ | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Salima Namusobya | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Andree Coupez | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dina Hashem | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Bharti Patel | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Gillian Skipper | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANJELA TANEJA | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ayan Hassan | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARCHER | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.70k | £204.99k | £149.14k | £324.86k | £132.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.03k | £65.42k | £191.07k | £203.68k | £229.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE THE RIGHT TO EDUCATION, AS DEFINED BY INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS LAW, BY: • SHARING INFORMATION, TOOLS AND RESOURCES ON THE RIGHT TO EDUCATION; • RESEARCHING INTO RIGHT TO EDUCATION ISSUES; • MONITOR ABUSES OF THE RIGHT TO EDUCATION; • RAISE AWARENESS ON RIGHT TO EDUCATION ISSUES; • PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO PARTNER CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANISATIONS ON RIGHT TO EDUCATION ISSUES; • INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF THE RIGHT TO EDUCATION; AND • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR THE RIGHT TO EDUCATION AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33-39
BOWLING GREEN LANE
EC1R 0BJ
- Phone:
- 02031220736
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window