THE LANCASTER JUDGES' LODGINGS MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our principal object is to support and promote the Judges' Lodgings Museum in Lancaster for the benefit of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 January 2017: CIO registration
- THE FRIENDS OF THE LANCASTER JUDGES' LODGINGS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JUMP | Chair | 19 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Adrienne Marcia Wallman | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Robin Smith | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.57k | £5.71k | £104 | £356 | £105 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.68k | £4.29k | £770 | £0 | £645 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 February 2024 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 19 JAN 2017 AMENDED ON 28 APR 2017 as amended on 06 Feb 2019 as amended on 17 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING AN UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND MATTERS OF HERITAGE, CULTURE AND HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THROUGH: (1) THE SUPPORT AND PROMOTION OF THE JUDGES' LODGINGS MUSEUM IN LANCASTER ("THE MUSEUM") FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (2) THE PRESERVATION CONSERVATION AND INTERPRETATION OF THE COLLECTIONS MANAGED BY THE CIO; (3) THE DEVELOPMENT OF FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND OF THE MUSEUM'S WORK WITH LOCAL SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS; (4) THE DEVELOPMENT OF COLLABORATIVE WORKING ARRANGEMENTS WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND PERSONS, AT LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LEVEL, WITH THE AIM OF PROMOTING AND PRESERVING THE HERITAGE OF LANCASTER; (5) THE CARRYING OUT AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH; (6) SO FAR AS CONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING, THE OPERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF ANY OTHER MUSEUM OR ART GALLERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Judges Lodgings Museum
Castle Hill
LANCASTER
LA1 1YS
- Phone:
- 07772100382
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window