MORIAH BAPTIST CHURCH RISCA

Charity Number: 1171405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Baptist church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £145,376
Total expenditure: £129,312

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Caerphilly

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2017: CIO registration
  • 10 September 2021: Funds received from 1143596 MORIAH BAPTIST CHURCH RISCA
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DAVID MARC OWEN Chair 01 January 2000
THE BAPTIST MISSIONARY SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE GWENT BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE WELSH BAPTIST UNION CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
The Ugly Duckling Charity
Received: On time
WALESWIDE CYMRUGYFAN
Recently registered
Florin Kondrat Trustee 27 November 2023
None on record
Sharon Lewis Trustee 27 November 2023
None on record
Joel Bradley De-Gare Pitt Trustee 27 November 2023
None on record
Rev TIMOTHY IAN MOODY Trustee 19 October 2018
THE ICE WALES TRUST
Received: On time
THE GWENT BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Coleg y Bedyddwyr Caerdydd / Cardiff Baptist College
Received: On time
COLEG Y BEDYDDWYR CAERDYDD / CARDIFF BAPTIST COLLEGE
Received: 255 days late
Andrew Brian Carey Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
GARETH WALTERS Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
Stephen John Hayward Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
DAVID JAMES COOPER Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record
Dr CATHERINE MARY WILLIAMS Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record
JORGE PINHEIRO Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record
CHRISTINE POWELL Trustee 01 January 2000
THE ICE WALES TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £133.51k £117.83k £127.16k £121.65k £145.38k
Total expenditure £145.88k £118.61k £125.59k £128.43k £129.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Moriah Baptist Church
Tredegar Street
Risca
Newport
NP11 6BU
Phone:
07590483986