THE OSCAR ROMERO AWARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and manage an Award to promote social justice in Catholic schools/colleges across the country, inspired by the example of St. Oscar Romero. Provide schools/colleges with an inclusive structure (framework) for exploring ways and developing strategies to put Catholic social justice into practice; An Award that recognises and celebrate a commitment to promoting social justice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Anthony Hartnett | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dervla McConn-Finch | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sister Jane Livesey | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Walter Andrew Hollas | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Watchorn | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Oldroyd | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashley Cranston Beck | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW QUINN | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.84k | £3.18k | £35.90k | £47.89k | £10.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £18.51k | £18.29k | £28.64k | £15.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2017 as amended on 12 May 2022 as amended on 11 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CATHOLIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF BLESSED ARCHBISHOP OSCAR ROMERO BY ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING AND PRACTICE OF THAT FAITH AS IT APPLIES TO THE EQUITABLE RELIEF OF SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND MATERIAL POVERTY BY USE OF AN ACCREDITED AWARD SYSTEM IN CATHOLIC EDUCATION INSTITUTIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKLANDS CATHOLIC SCHOOL
STAKES HILL ROAD
WATERLOOVILLE
PO7 7BW
- Phone:
- 02392259214
- Email:
- contact@romeroaward.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window