YIEWSLEY AND WEST DRAYTON FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yiewsley and West Drayton Foodbank provides emergency food and support to people experiencing crisis through outlets situated in areas of need throughout Yiewsley, West Drayton, the Heathrow Villages and surrounding areas. These outlets operate under licence, using The Trussell Trust model.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 16 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANE HELEN FAICHNEY | Chair | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT DAVID CHARRINGTON | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE SYLVIA YOUNG | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DORIS GRACE HUGHES | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETRINA NICKAY RABY | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.33k | £57.32k | £30.99k | £28.26k | £41.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £18.76k | £26.80k | £30.26k | £37.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.75k | N/A | £410 | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN YIEWSLEY, WEST DRAYTON AND THE HEATHROW VILLAGES IN PARTICULAR AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES, SUPPORT AND ADVICE, TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. AND WHERE INDIVIDUALS WISH OR DESIRE, SHARE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN A SENSITIVE AND APPROPRIATE MANNER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Matthews Church
High Street
Yiewsley
WEST DRAYTON
UB7 7QH
- Phone:
- 07462097357
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window