MORECAMBE BAY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Morecambe Bay Partnership celebrates and encourages greater understanding and enjoyment of the Bay area's natural, cultural and historic assets; conserves the unique wildlife, culture and heritage; connects people with their place and with one another to improve their quality of life; and collaborates with key partners and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £342,419 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 June 2017: CIO registration
- 20 June 2022: Funds received from 1089559 MORECAMBE BAY PARTNERSHIP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry McLoughlin | Chair | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hawker | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Eagles | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Baird | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Salveson | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kemp | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harrison Stewart | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Georgina Young | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Holroyd | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Delia Finan | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS BURDITT | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA PARSONS | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352.95k | £336.84k | £361.93k | £524.83k | £493.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.35k | £328.58k | £422.53k | £485.05k | £626.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £67.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £181.42k | £13.93k | £175.48k | £322.07k | £342.42k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £512.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £455.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF MORECAMBE BAY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROTECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BAY'S COASTAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURAL AND CULTURAL HISTORY, CONSERVATION, ENVIRONMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF MORECAMBE BAY. 3) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF MORECAMBE BAY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE MORECAMBE BAY AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stricklandgate House
92 Stricklandgate
KENDAL
CUMBRIA
LA9 4PU
- Phone:
- 07880 345754
- Email:
- info@morecambebay.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window