THE OVERTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of a Community Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 February 2017: CIO registration
- 13 November 2018: Funds received from 276492 THE OVERTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA BAKER | Chair | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Davenport | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Colin John William Phillimore | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Troman | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward James Williams | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
lAUREN MCCANN | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN CHALLEN | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY CARTER | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.62k | £61.64k | £39.01k | £29.73k | £43.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.78k | £51.39k | £20.10k | £52.84k | £74.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.70k | £10.67k | N/A | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF OVERTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SICIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OJBECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR ANY OTHER BODY NOMINATED BY THEM IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION OR ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 WINCHESTER STREET
OVERTON
BASINGSTOKE
RG25 3HT
- Phone:
- 01256771219
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window