PARKER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A resource at 25 Kayll Rd Sunderland for young people providing advice, assistance, programmes of physical, educational & other activities as a means of : - advancing in life & helping them to develop their skills, capacities & capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature & responsible individuals; - advancing education; & - relieving unemployment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 10 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Preece | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Tony Preece | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Galbraith | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Susan Rackstraw | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Pat Dyball | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrea Solomon | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.08k | £28.00k | £64.27k | £94.36k | £102.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.50k | £24.93k | £42.44k | £66.24k | £71.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.63k | £10.00k | £3.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN SUNDERLAND AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS AND FAMILY MEMBERS AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF; (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARKER TRUST HOUSE
25 Kayll Road
SUNDERLAND
SR4 7TW
- Phone:
- 01915437123
- Email:
- admin@parkertrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window