CAUDWELL'S MILL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and maintenance of unique water powered flour milling machinery. Open to the pblic for information and educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £16,568 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 February 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Noel Walsh | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Brian McKenzie | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Hobson | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Rogers | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN CHURCH | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Margree | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
John Miley | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JUDITH ANNE TWIGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.75k | £95.43k | £90.42k | £186.53k | £143.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.76k | £107.42k | £120.22k | £105.88k | £152.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £13.94k | £16.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SECURING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND USE OF CAUDWELL'S MILL SITUATE AT ROWSLEY IN DERBYSHIRE AND ANY SIMILAR INDUSTRIAL BUILDINGS PLANT AND MONUMENTS OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND THE INHABITANTS OF DERBYSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES IN PARTICULAR.
Area of benefit
DERBYSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WICKEN COTTAGE
THE LANE
STANTON-IN-THE-PEAK
MATLOCK
DE4 2LX
- Phone:
- 01629636267
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
caudwellsmill.museum.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window