BOURNEMOUTH METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO BE ACTIVE IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANTONY JOHN CAVANAGH | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Sarah Anne Godden | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Bolt | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Brown | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Margaret Slattery | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Anne Graham | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Clarke Thompson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Mary James | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Drayton | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jayne Joy | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr David Julian Tawn | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul William Parkes | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET EVE BRAY | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ROANTREE | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND MURRAY | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE JOY | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anita Hazell | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY FERNAND | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MCCOY | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|||||
SUSAN SAUNDERS | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY FERNAND | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET DRAYTON | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS LEWER | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suzie Viana Deacon | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.36k | £262.80k | £198.89k | £257.45k | £336.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.48k | £309.03k | £234.00k | £265.17k | £310.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.89k | £9.80k | £233 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 January 2023 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 January 2023 | 198 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 January 2023 | 563 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 January 2023 | 563 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF:- A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA PARK METHODIST CHURCH
EDGEHILL ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH9 2QG
- Phone:
- 01202512225
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window