Financial history SUCCESS STORIES

Charity number: 1173522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £298.63k £946.79k £726.18k £746.40k £480.62k
Total expenditure £233.88k £652.92k £1.07m £751.55k £378.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £264.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £946.79k £726.18k £746.40k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £652.92k £1.07m £751.55k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £538.06k £902.90k £647.73k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A