Financial history HYTHE BAY CHILDREN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1175752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £547.21k £509.76k £625.06k £619.73k £679.42k
Total expenditure £565.49k £490.03k £560.10k £561.84k £668.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £47.79k £235.77k £271.03k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.07k £52.06k £1.60k £1.29k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £539.02k £450.49k £370.83k £350.43k £677.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £120 £41 £8 £431 £1.82k
Income - Other £0 £7.17k £252.63k £267.58k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £404.17k £345.91k £388.28k £404.01k £468.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.84k £3.82k £4.37k £3.42k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £161.32k £144.11k £171.83k £157.83k £200.57k