Financial history HOPE FOR THE FUTURE

Charity Number: 1173547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £644.52k £961.12k £875.67k £813.48k £542.03k
Total expenditure £390.93k £708.76k £987.30k £833.36k £556.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £639.06k £951.56k £24.92k £799.57k £499.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £14.00k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.33k £9.29k £836.40k £11.39k £37.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £127 £268 £347 £2.52k £4.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £377.53k £652.62k £949.97k £679.80k £456.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.40k £56.15k £37.33k £26.05k £5.29k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £127.51k £95.29k