SIMON COOPER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation raises and provide funds to specialist medical care providers including hospitals and hospices associated with Cancer, Cystic Fibrosis and life limiting conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNY ARWAS | Chair | 03 August 2017 |
|
|||||
PAUL STEVEN COOPER | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL KINGSLEY | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MICHELLE WOOLFE | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SANDRA COOPER | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.30k | £3.28k | £5.58k | £8.72k | £10.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £5.58k | £0 | £15.23k | £8.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 October 2021 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CIO, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Tynedale
London Colney
ST. ALBANS
AL2 1TF
- Phone:
- 07958-621301
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window