WESTON PARK HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT FUND LTD

Charity number: 509803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity funds research and improves treatment and care for local people living with and after cancer. The Charity provides care and support for people affected by cancer, during and after treatment, through our information and support centre and outreach work. We also fund: (1)research into the causes of, and improved treatment for, cancer (2)cancer treatment services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Derbyshire
  • Doncaster
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WESTON PARK CANCER INFORMATION AND SUPPORT CENTRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Grey MBE Trustee 12 March 2025
SHEFFIELD CITY TRUST
Received: On time
CAVENDISH CANCER CARE
Received: On time
David Malcolm Thurkettle Trustee 12 March 2025
CAVENDISH CANCER CARE
Received: On time
Amy Rebecca Hallam Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Dr Satya V R Garikipati Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Louise Merriman Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Peter O'Connell Trustee 24 February 2023
None on record
Darrell Re Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record
Dr James Catto Trustee 12 December 2022
None on record
Melinda Schofield Trustee 25 September 2022
None on record
Timothy Brazier Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Nigel Beasley Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Rev David Bussue Trustee 10 December 2020
VOLUNTARY ACTION SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
CHURCH OF GOD OF PROPHECY TRUST
Received: On time
Steven Wragg Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.60m £1.72m £2.19m £2.22m £2.58m
Total expenditure £2.59m £1.78m £1.69m £2.47m £2.20m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.39m £1.49m £2.06m £2.09m £2.31m
Income - Other trading activities £12.96k £23.19k £114.00k £93.90k £127.38k
Income - Charitable activities £78.57k £19.64k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.40k £16.32k £14.00k £40.25k £146.05k
Income - Other £77.76k £169.72k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £831.46k £730.30k £604.00k £511.01k £1.21m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.94m £1.19m £1.09m £1.77m £1.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £649.69k £591.40k £606.00k £704.87k £739.49k
Expenditure - Governance £69.80k £44.06k £81.00k £64.44k £69.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.11m £372.31k £159.00k £830.18k £361.81k
Expenditure - Investment management £5.59k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £39.74k £47.12k £32.00k £109.27k £123.23k
Long-term investments £436.26k £528.34k £531.00k £463.21k £489.25k
Other assets £5.33m £4.86m £4.66m £4.56m £4.97m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £466.53k £1.69m £961.00k £1.17m £1.22m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH JANUARY 2000 AND AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16TH FEB 2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND IN PARTICULAR TO MAKE GRANTS TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF WESTON PARK HOSPITAL IN THE TREATMENT AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER RELATED DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 August 1994 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
WESTON PARK HOSP DEV FUND LTD
23 NORTHUMBERLAND ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 2TX
Phone:
01145533330