FOOD AND FARMING DISCOVERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in Norfolk, in particular the education of children of school age, in food production, farming and countryside, ensuring its presented in a neutral and balanced manner.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 06 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Frances Penlington | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Courtney Quick Burtwright | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Laurence White | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Catherine Mary Richards | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alexander Nicholas | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Poul Jorgen Hovesen | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Burgess Turner | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steffan Daniel Anderson Griffiths | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.66k | £40.25k | £91.25k | £76.59k | £50.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.56k | £27.06k | £60.60k | £54.99k | £78.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2024 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2024 | 343 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN NORFOLK, IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF SCHOOL AGE, IN FOOD PRODUCTION, FARMING AND COUNTRYSIDE EDUCATION, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, ENSURING THE EDUCATION IS PRESENTED IN A NEUTRAL AND BALANCED MANNER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RNAA NORFOLK SHOWGROUND
DEREHAM ROAD
NORWICH
NR5 0TT
- Phone:
- 01603748729
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window