Financial history THE MAASAI ASSOCIATION UK TRUST

Charity Number: 1173581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £854 £830 £1.35k £877 £954
Total expenditure £1.13k £1.08k £1.02k £1.15k £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A