ONE PUNCH UK UNITED LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awareness of the damage a One Punch can do Support and Signposting for Victims and Families of One Punch Assaults
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAXINE THOMPSON CURL | Chair | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Androlla Parker McGowan | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Urwin | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Tracy Crow | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.70k | £8.63k | £21.83k | £5.47k | £21.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £11.22k | £12.72k | £4.31k | £15.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 December 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 January 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 December 2020 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1 TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE CONSEQUENCES OF VIOLENT CRIME IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF CAMPAIGNS TO THE PUBLIC AND WORKSHOPS TO AGENCIES AND ORGANISATIONS TO REDUCE AND PREVENT FUTURE VIOLENCE; 1.2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE SUPPORT OF VICTIMS AND THEIR FAMILIES AFFECTED BY VIOLENT CRIMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Quadrus Centre Room 102
The Quadrus Centre
Boldon
NE35 9PF
- Phone:
- 08000484813
- Email:
- info@onepunch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window