NORTH SALFORD SYNAGOGUE

Charity Number: 1172747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Upkeep, maintaining and running of a Synagogue

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £208,775
Total expenditure: £121,288

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Salford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REUBEN SMITH Chair 06 March 2017
None on record
RODNEY SAUL MYERS Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
JOSHUA PINE Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £156.87k £119.97k £110.01k £126.70k £208.78k
Total expenditure £91.80k £117.27k £128.95k £125.29k £121.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.92k £20.55k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
North Salford Synagogue
2 Vine Street
SALFORD
M7 3PG
Phone:
01617400522
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available