UNIVERSITY OF YORK STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1173404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The University of York Students' Union seeks to enhance the student experience by providing representation, welfare services, social space and opportunities for student development within the Union and the wider community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 January 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • YUSU (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Teddy Bland Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Sinead Daly Trustee 01 August 2024
UNIVERSITY OF YORK GRADUATE STUDENTS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Lesley-Anne McClean Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Dominic Smithies Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Kate Collins Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Tiffany Agbobu Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Lewis Parrey Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Freddy Russell Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Kaitlyn Beattie-Zarb Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Fenella Johnson Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Genevieve Mariette Primrose Andrews Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Matthew Young Trustee 24 July 2023
None on record
Georgina Crean Trustee 25 May 2022
None on record
Karishma Asher Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.39m £4.18m £5.77m £5.77m £5.73m
Total expenditure £4.47m £3.83m £5.63m £5.93m £5.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £236.15k £516.62k £13.08k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.42m £1.83m £1.88m £2.16m £2.19m
Income - Other trading activities £1.13m £719.65k £1.36m £1.34m £1.20m
Income - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.11m £2.51m £2.24m £2.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.44k £3.79k £5.76k £27.16k £51.54k
Income - Other £236.15k £516.62k £13.08k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.97m £2.57m £4.22m £4.48m £4.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.50m £1.26m £1.40m £1.46m £1.23m
Expenditure - Governance £14.76k £14.68k £18.97k £18.95k £20.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £60.80k £95.37k £120.64k £126.19k £104.58k
Long-term investments £1 £1 £0 £0 £1
Other assets £1.02m £1.38m £1.67m £1.29m £1.40m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£609.03k -£589.92k -£567.82k -£504.25k -£657.39k
Total liabilities £162.16k £228.12k £422.27k £227.02k £211.47k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 15 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 09 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 20 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2011
Charitable objects
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF YORK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF YORK DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND THE UNIVERSITY OF YORK AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 03 January 2012 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
YUSU
University of York
Heslington
YORK
YO10 5DD
Phone:
01904 32 3724