TAVISTOCK HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THT runs a range of activities to inform the public about the heritage of the Tavistock area, including guided walks, lectures and open days. Our main project is the restoration and repurposing of the Tavistock Guildhall to create a new Visitor Interpretation Centre which will introduce visitors to the history of the town and the Cornwall & West Devon Mining Landscape World Heritage Site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 10 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GERALDINE PARLBY | Chair | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Conn | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Crosbie | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON MATTHEW HIRST | Trustee | 29 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MAIN | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WRIGHT | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR PHILIP RICHARD SANDERS | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.34k | £38.55k | £44.22k | £93.08k | £21.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.48k | £19.99k | £88.33k | £116.39k | £22.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.53k | £21.93k | £27.32k | £63.68k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUN 2017 as amended on 17 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
Tavistock Heritage Trust will carry out for public benefit 1. The advancement of education in particular the history and heritage of the town of Tavistock a UNESCO World Heritage Town and the surrounding area, by providing exhibitions, walks, talks, courses, visits for schools and other learning activities. 2. Promotion and support for the preservation of archaeological and historic sites around and in the town of Tavistock by raising funds and increasing awareness of them and their significance and working alongside other likeminded organisations. 3. The provision of information and advice about local history, heritage and places of interest in and around the town of Tavistock and the UNESCO World Heritage Site through a volunteer led visitor information centre and gift shop in the town. 4. Provide information in relation to the history and heritage of the Town of Tavistock and the surrounding area by publishing books, films, audio recordings and other literature.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Guildhall
Guildhall Square
Abbey Place
TAVISTOCK
Devon
PL19 0FW
- Phone:
- 07887 534256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window