THE GUSTAV METZGER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to combat the risk of global extinction arising from the activities of humans, and also to assist artists, but as it has not yet received funding from the estate of Gustav Metzger the trustees have not been able to start its activities yet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2017: CIO registration
- THE GUSTAV METZGER FOUNDATION CIO (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT DAVID CRAIG LLM, AKC | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
ANDREW DUNCAN GAMMON MA CTA | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 April 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 April 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE AS FOLLOWS: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTISTIC AND LITERARY WORK OF GUSTAV METZGER FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF: (A) STUDENTS STUDYING THE ARTS (B) STUDENTS STUDYING SUBJECTS RELATING TO THE ENVIRONMENT (C) ARTISTS (D) WRITERS (E) ENVIRONMENTALISTS (F) ECOLOGISTS (G) THINKERS AND EDUCATORS (H) AND OTHERS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT (3) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (D) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; (F) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; (G) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; (H) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (J) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (K) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (L) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT (3) BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. (4) TO PROMOTE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES. (5) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (6) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (7) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROTECT AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AS A CONSEQUENCE OF ANY CHANGE TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT (MAN-MADE OR OTHERWISE). (8) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, WORLD ECOLOGY AND THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO CONDUCT AND PROCURE RESEARCH CONCERNING WORLD ECOLOGY AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE EFFECTS ON THAT ENVIRONMENT OF BOTH NATURAL AND MAN-MADE OR OTHER ACTIVITIES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. (9) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF THOSE IN NEED AS A CONSEQUENCE OF ANY CHANGE TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT (MAN-MADE OR OTHERWISE). (10) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. IN RESPECT OF OBJECTS (2) TO (10)ABOVE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Howard Kennedy Llp
No 1 London Bridge
LONDON
SE1 9BG
- Phone:
- 02037555421
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window