THE VIP - VIOLENCE INTERVENTION PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The VIP work with young people involved in gangs and serious youth violence, providing emotional and practical support. We aim to develop strong, trusting, therapeutic relationships with clients enabling difficult emotions to be discussed and processed leading to a better ability to contain ones emotions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £21,453 from 1 government contract(s) and £149,107 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Leslie | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Desiree Blamey | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Goddard | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alessandro Ferrari | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Osric Richards | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.86k | £260.71k | £305.76k | £480.76k | £421.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.55k | £205.60k | £302.92k | £425.93k | £467.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.90k | £97.97k | N/A | N/A | £21.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.55k | £126.32k | £88.50k | £257.13k | £149.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Nov 2017 as amended on 31 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE INVOLVED IN, OR AT RISK OF INVOLVEMENT IN, SERIOUS YOUTH VIOLENCE THUS IMPROVING THEIR COMMUNITIES AND LIVES OF THEMSELVES AND OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4
Hammersmith Broadway
LONDON
W6 7AL
- Phone:
- 07864855763
- Email:
- charlie@vip.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window