Financial history LODDON VALLEY LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1174565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £35.63k £20.79k £69.49k £25.88k £17.49k
Total expenditure £50.23k £16.71k £53.14k £26.15k £20.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A