Financial history THE SUNRISE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1172756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £100.57k £295.14k £149.56k £38.65k £1.04m
Total expenditure £225.44k £240.66k £241.87k £251.46k £502.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.98k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £499.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.47k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £379.26k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.99k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0